Refine your search

21 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
11/18/2013 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
11/14/2013-3:03pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013-3:03pm House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 228 - 195 (Roll no. 581). (text: CR H7069)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013-2:54pm House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 197 - 225 (Roll no. 580).
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013-2:24pm House The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H7078)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013-2:14pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lewis motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to prohibit provisions of the bill from applying to any cases brought under civil rights laws or the Constitution.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013-2:14pm House Mr. Lewis moved to recommit with instructions to Judiciary. (consideration: CR H7077-7078; text: CR H7077)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013-2:14pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H7077)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013-1:11pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2655.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013-1:11pm House The resolution provides for the consideration of H.R. 2655 and H.R. 982. In the case of H.R. 2655, the resolution provides for one hour of debate and one motion to recommit. In the case of H.R. 982, the resolution provides for one hour of general debate and makes in order only those amendments printed in the Rules Committee report. The resolution also provides for one motion to recommit the bill H.R. 982.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013-1:11pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 403. (consideration: CR H7069-7079)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2013-7:17pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 403 Reported to House. The resolution provides for the consideration of H.R. 2655 and H.R. 982. In the case of H.R. 2655, the resolution provides for one hour of debate and one motion to recommit. In the case of H.R. 982, the resolution provides for one hour of general debate and makes in order only those amendments printed in the Rules Committee report. The resolution also provides for one motion to recommit the bill H.R. 982.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
10/30/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 181.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
10/30/2013 House Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-255.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary
09/11/2013 House Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 10.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary
09/11/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary
07/17/2013 House Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 6 - 2 .
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice
07/17/2013 House Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice
07/15/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary
07/11/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
07/11/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives