Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/30/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/16/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/05/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/05/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/10/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/10/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/07/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 01/07/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/27/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/27/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/27/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/07/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/20/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/28/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/30/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/18/2014