Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/27/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/23/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 09/10/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/10/2014