Text: H.R.2668 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (07/24/2013)

Calendar No. 145

113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 2668

To delay the application of the individual health insurance mandate, to delay the application of the employer health insurance mandate, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
July 23, 2013

Received; read the first time

July 24, 2013

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To delay the application of the individual health insurance mandate, to delay the application of the employer health insurance mandate, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Table of Contents.

The table of contents for this Act is as follows:


Sec. 1. Table of Contents.

Sec. 101. Short title.

Sec. 102. Delay in application of individual health insurance mandate.

Sec. 201. Short title.

Sec. 202. Delay in application of employer health insurance mandate.

SEC. 101. Short title.

This title may be cited as the “Fairness for American Families Act”.

SEC. 102. Delay in application of individual health insurance mandate.

(a) In general.—Section 5000A(a) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking “2013” and inserting “2014”.

(b) Conforming amendments.—

(1) Section 5000A(c)(2)(B) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended—

(A) by striking “2014” in clause (i) and inserting “2015”, and

(B) by striking “2015” in clauses (ii) and (iii) and inserting “2016”.

(2) Section 5000A(c)(3)(B) of such Code is amended—

(A) by striking “2014” and inserting “2015”, and

(B) by striking “2015” (prior to amendment by subparagraph (A)) and inserting “2016”.

(3) Section 5000A(c)(3)(D) of such Code is amended—

(A) by striking “2016” and inserting “2017”, and

(B) by striking “2015” and inserting “2016”.

(4) Section 5000A(e)(1)(D) of such Code is amended—

(A) by striking “2014” and inserting “2015”, and

(B) by striking “2013” and inserting “2014”.

(c) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect as if included in section 1501 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.

SEC. 201. Short title.

This title may be cited as the “Authority for Mandate Delay Act”.

SEC. 202. Delay in application of employer health insurance mandate.

(a) In general.—Section 1513(d) of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act is amended by striking “December 31, 2013” and inserting “December 31, 2014”.

(b) Reporting requirements.—

(1) REPORTING BY EMPLOYERS.—Section 1514(d) of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act is amended by striking “December 31, 2013” and inserting “December 31, 2014”.

(2) REPORTING BY INSURANCE PROVIDERS.—Section 1502(e) of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act is amended by striking “2013” and inserting “2014”.

(c) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect as if included in the provision of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to which they relate.

Passed the House of Representatives July 17, 2013.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 145

113th CONGRESS
     1st Session
H. R. 2668

AN ACT
To delay the application of the individual health insurance mandate, to delay the application of the employer health insurance mandate, and for other purposes.

July 24, 2013
Read the second time and placed on the calendar