There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Hydropower Regulatory Efficiency Act of 2013

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Hydropower Regulatory Efficiency Act of 2013

Short Titles as Reported to House

Hydropower Regulatory Efficiency Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Hydropower Regulatory Efficiency Act of 2013

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Hydropower Regulatory Efficiency Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve hydropower, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
08/09/2013Became Public Law No: 113-23. (TXT | PDF)
08/09/2013Signed by President.
08/06/2013Presented to President.
08/01/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6257)
06/03/2013By Senator Wyden from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 113-38.
05/13/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. Without written report.
02/13/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 40).(text: CR 2/12/2013 H439-440)
02/04/2013Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-6.
01/15/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/09/2013Became Public Law No: 113-23. (TXT | PDF)
08/09/2013Signed by President.
08/06/2013HousePresented to President.
08/02/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6257)
06/03/2013SenateBy Senator Wyden from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 113-38.
05/13/2013SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 71.
05/13/2013SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. Without written report.
05/08/2013SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/23/2013SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-24.
02/14/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
02/13/2013-1:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/13/2013-1:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 40). (text: CR 2/12/2013 H439-440)
02/13/2013-1:44pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H481)
02/12/2013-2:24pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/12/2013-2:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 267.
02/12/2013-2:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H439-441)
02/12/2013-2:19pmHouseMr. Whitfield moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/04/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 4.
02/04/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-6.
01/18/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/15/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/15/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/15/2013 Referred to
02/04/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-6
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power01/18/2013 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/14/2013 Referred to
04/23/2013 Hearings by
05/08/2013 Markup by
05/13/2013 Reported by S. Rept. 113-38

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for H.R.267. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-23 (08/09/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

Hydropower Regulatory Efficiency Act of 2013 - (Sec. 3) Amends the Public Utility Regulatory Policies Act of 1978 (PURPA) to increase from 5,000 to 10,000 kilowatts the size of small hydroelectric power projects which the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) may exempt from its license requirements.

(Sec. 4) Amends the Federal Power Act to revise the limitation on the maximum installation capacity of qualifying conduit hydropower facilities that are eligible for an exemption from licensing requirements.

Requires any person, state, or municipality proposing to construct a qualifying conduit hydropower facility to file with FERC a notice of intent to do so. Requires FERC, within 15 days after receiving such a notice of intent, to make an initial determination as to whether the facility meets the qualifying criteria.

Waives license requirements for any conduit hydroelectric facility that: (1) uses for electric power generation only the hydroelectric potential of a non-federally owned conduit, (2) has a maximum installed capacity of 5 megawatts, and (3) is not currently licensed or exempted from license requirements.

Redefines "conduit" to specify any tunnel, canal, pipeline, aqueduct, flume, ditch, or similar manmade water conveyance operated for the distribution of water for agricultural, municipal, or industrial consumption and not primarily for the generation of electricity.

Authorizes FERC to: (1) exempt from license requirements any electric power generation facility that utilizes for such generation only the hydroelectric potential of a conduit, and has an installed capacity or 40 megawatts or fewer; and (2) extend the preliminary permit period for up to 2 additional years beyond the 3 years otherwise allowed if it finds that the permittee has implemented activities under the permit in good faith and with reasonable diligence.

(Sec. 6) Directs FERC to: (1) investigate the feasibility of issuing a license for hydropower development at nonpowered dams and closed loop pumped storage projects during a two-year period, and (2) hold workshops and develop hydropower pilot projects.

(Sec. 7) Directs the Secretary of Energy (DOE) to study: (1) the technical flexibility that existing pumped storage facilities can provide to support intermittent renewable electric energy generation, including the potential for such facilities to be upgraded or retrofitted with advanced commercially available technology; and (2) the technical potential of existing pumped storage facilities and new advanced pumped storage facilities to provide grid reliability benefits.