Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/16/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-213.
12/16/2014 Signed by President.
12/10/2014 Presented to President.
12/08/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/08/2014 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6395-6396)
09/10/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 2 (Roll no. 492).(text: CR 9/8/2014 H7252)
07/11/2013 Introduced in House