Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/11/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 08/02/2013