Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/11/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 09/09/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/17/2013