Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/11/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/24/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 07/26/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 12/23/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 12/11/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 12/11/2014