Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/18/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/26/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/16/2013