Refine your search

Refined by:

South Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 09/09/2013