Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 07/11/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/10/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/10/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/27/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/12/2014