There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Energy Savings Through Public-Private Partnerships Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

Energy Savings Through Public-Private Partnerships Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Energy Conservation Policy Act to encourage the increased use of performance contracting in Federal facilities.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/19/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-627.
07/16/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
11/19/2014Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 467.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-627.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/30/2014Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/30/2014Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/29/2014Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/19/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/16/2013Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/16/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/17/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/17/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/09/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/11/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/19/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/23/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 11/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/25/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/13/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/25/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/16/2013 Referred to
04/30/2014 Markup by
11/19/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-627
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power07/19/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2689. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (11/19/2014)

Energy Savings Through Public-Private Partnerships Act of 2014 - Amends the National Energy Conservation Policy Act (NECPA) to revise requirements for energy savings performance contracts. (These contracts allow federal agencies to work with private contractors on energy efficiency upgrades to federal facilities.)

Directs each federal facility energy manager to provide an explanation regarding life cycle cost-effective measures that have not been implemented as part of the web-based compliance certification system. (Life cycle costs are the total cost of owning, operating, and maintaining a building over its useful life.)

Requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to report to the President and Congress on each agency's energy savings performance contracts and utility energy service contracts, including their investment value and their energy savings.

Expands the kinds of energy conservation measures that may be implemented under the contracts by including those involving energy consuming devices and required support structures.

Prohibits agencies from limiting recognition of operation and maintenance savings associated with energy systems that were modernized or replaced with energy conservation measures and water conservation measures (e.g. lower energy and water bills thanks to energy efficiency and conservation measures).

Authorizes agencies to sell or transfer energy savings and apply the proceeds to fund a contract.

Expands the meaning of energy savings to include: (1) the use, sale, or transfer of energy incentives, rebates, or credits (including renewable energy credits) from federal, state, or local governments or utilities; and (2) any revenue generated from a reduction in energy or water use, more efficient waste recycling, or additional energy generated from more efficient equipment.