Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/09/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/10/2014