Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 01/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 01/15/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 01/15/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 01/15/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/04/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/04/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/26/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/19/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/21/2014