There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Saving America's Pollinators Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to take certain actions related to pesticides that may affect pollinators, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/16/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
08/13/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/16/2013Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1066)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/24/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/25/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/25/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/30/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/30/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/12/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/12/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/17/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/20/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/26/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/03/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/03/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/03/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/03/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/05/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/08/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/08/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/29/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/29/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/25/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/25/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/02/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/09/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/22/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/19/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/19/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/19/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/09/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/10/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/15/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/16/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture07/16/2013 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture08/13/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2692.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2692. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/16/2013)

Saving America's Pollinators Act of 2013 - Requires the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to suspend the registration of imidacloprid, clothianidin, thiamethoxam, dinotafuran, and any other members of the nitro group of neonicotinoid insecticides to the extent such insecticide is registered under the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act (FIFRA) for use in seed treatment, soil application, or foliar treatment on bee attractive plants, trees, and cereals until the Administrator has made a determination that such insecticide will not cause unreasonable adverse effects on pollinators. Requires such a determination to be based on: (1) an evaluation of the published and peer-reviewed scientific evidence on whether the use or uses of such neonicotinoids cause unreasonable adverse effects on pollinators, including native bees, honeybees, birds, bats, and other species of beneficial insects; and (2) a completed field study that meets the criteria required by the Administrator and evaluates residues, including residue build-up after repeated annual application, chronic low-dose exposure, and cumulative effects of multiple chemical exposures.

Prohibits the Administrator from issuing any new registrations of the pesticides listed in this Act for any seed treatment, soil application, and foliar treatment on bee attractive plants, trees, and cereals under FIFRA until the Administrator has made such determination with respect to such insecticide.

Requires the Secretary of the Interior, in coordination with the Administrator, to: (1) regularly monitor the health and population status of native bees, (2) identify the scope and likely causes of unusual native bee mortality, and (3) submit to Congress and make public an annual report on such health and population status.