Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/24/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/20/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/03/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/03/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/08/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/19/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/19/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/19/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/09/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/10/2014