Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/30/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/03/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/11/2013