Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/01/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/02/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 12/10/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/27/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/29/2014