Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 12/10/2013