Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/16/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/16/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/10/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/10/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/10/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/10/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 10/22/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/16/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/25/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/11/2014