Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/17/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/17/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/17/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/17/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 07/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/16/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/17/2014