Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/17/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/10/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/11/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/17/2013