Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 07/17/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/18/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/18/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/18/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/18/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/18/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/18/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/22/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/22/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/22/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/22/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/22/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/31/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/31/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/31/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 08/02/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 09/09/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/28/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 10/11/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/02/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/2014