Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
07/25/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-130.
07/25/2014 Signed by President.
07/15/2014 Presented to President.
07/09/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4364)
11/18/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 0 (Roll no. 589).(text: CR H7165-7166)
01/15/2013 Introduced in House