There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs and Department of Defense joint outpatient clinic to be constructed in Marina, California, as the "Major General William H. Gourley VA-DOD Outpatient Clinic".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs and Department of Defense joint outpatient clinic to be constructed in Marina, California, as the "General William H. Gourley Federal Outpatient Clinic: A Joint VA-DOD Health Care Facility".


Actions Overview (6)

Date
07/25/2014Became Public Law No: 113-130. (TXT | PDF)
07/25/2014Signed by President.
07/15/2014Presented to President.
07/09/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4364)
11/18/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 0 (Roll no. 589).(text: CR H7165-7166)
01/15/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
07/25/2014Became Public Law No: 113-130. (TXT | PDF)
07/25/2014Signed by President.
07/15/2014HousePresented to President.
07/10/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/09/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4364)
11/19/2013SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/18/2013-7:06pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/18/2013-7:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 0 (Roll no. 589). (text: CR H7165-7166)
11/18/2013-6:58pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7168)
11/18/2013-5:53pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/18/2013-5:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 272.
11/18/2013-5:43pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7165-7167)
11/18/2013-5:43pmHouseMr. Wenstrup moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/31/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
01/22/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/15/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/15/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/15/2013HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H99)
01/15/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/06/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/06/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/06/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/06/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/06/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/06/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/06/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/06/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/06/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/06/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/06/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 06/06/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/06/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/06/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/06/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/06/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/06/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/11/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/11/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/13/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/13/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 06/13/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/13/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/13/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/13/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/13/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/18/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/18/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/19/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 06/19/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/20/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 06/20/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/20/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 10/23/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/28/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/28/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 10/28/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services01/15/2013 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel01/31/2013 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs01/15/2013 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health01/22/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.272.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.272. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-130 (07/25/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on November 18, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) and Department of Defense (DOD) joint outpatient clinic to be constructed in Marina, California, as the "Major General William H. Gourley VA-DOD Outpatient Clinic."