Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/31/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/10/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/29/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/07/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/10/2014