Refine your search

45 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
12/09/2013 Senate Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 255.
Type of Action: Calendars
11/21/2013 Senate Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Type of Action: Calendars
11/20/2013-5:41pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-5:41pm House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 235 - 187 (Roll no. 604).
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-5:30pm House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 188 - 232 (Roll no. 603). (consideration: CR H7297)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-5:15pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lowenthal motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House forthwith with an amendment to ensure that the underlying bill does not limit the authority of the Department of Interior or any state to require the public disclosure of chemicals used in hydraulic fracturing.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-5:14pm House Mr. Lowenthal moved to recommit with instructions to Natural Resources. (consideration: CR H7295-7296; text: CR H7295)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-5:13pm House The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitue: CR H7288)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-5:13pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H7295)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-5:13pm House The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 2728.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-5:12pm House H.Amdt.510 On agreeing to the DeFazio amendment (A005) Failed by recorded vote: 142 - 276 (Roll no. 602).
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-5:05pm House MOMENT OF SILENCE - The House observed a moment of silence in remembrance of our brave men and women who have given their lives in the service of our country, and of all who serve in our armed forces and their familes.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-5:04pm House H.Amdt.507 On agreeing to the Holt amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 190 - 230 (Roll no. 601).
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:34pm House UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on adoption of amendments which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:34pm House H.Amdt.511 On agreeing to the Jackson Lee amendment (A006) Agreed to by voice vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:29pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 419, the Committee of Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Jackson Lee (TX) Part B amendment No. 5.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:29pm House H.Amdt.511 Amendment (A006) offered by Ms. Jackson Lee. (consideration: CR H7293-7294; text: CR H7293)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:29pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the DeFazio Part B amendment No. 4, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. DeFazio demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:17pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 419, the Committee of Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the DeFazio Part B amendment No. 4.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:17pm House H.Amdt.510 Amendment (A005) offered by Mr. DeFazio. (consideration: CR H7292-7293, H7295; text: CR H7292)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:17pm House H.Amdt.509 On agreeing to the Reed amendment (A004) as modified Agreed to by voice vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:12pm House H.Amdt.509 Reed amendment (A004) modified by unanimous consent. (text as modified: CR H7291)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:11pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 419, the Committee of Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Reed Part B amendment No. 3.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:11pm House H.Amdt.509 Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Reed. (consideration: CR H7291-7292; text: CR 7291)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:10pm House H.Amdt.508 On agreeing to the Flores amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:03pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 419, the Committee of Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Flores Part B amendment No. 2.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:03pm House H.Amdt.508 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Flores. (consideration: CR H7290-7291; text: CR H7290)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-4:03pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Holt Part B amendment No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Holt demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-3:54pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 419, the Committee of Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Holt Part B amendment No. 1.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-3:54pm House H.Amdt.507 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Holt. (consideration: CR H7289-7290, H7294; text: CR H7289)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-2:44pm House GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 2728.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-2:44pm House The Speaker designated the Honorable Kevin Yoder to act as Chairman of the Committee.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-2:44pm House House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 419 and Rule XVIII.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-2:44pm House The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1965 and H.R. 2728. The resolution provides for one hour of debate and makes in order only those further amendments printed in the Rules report 113-271. The rule provides one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/20/2013-2:43pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 419. (consideration: CR H7280-7297)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/19/2013-2:11pm House Rule H. Res. 419 passed House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/18/2013-7:13pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 419 Reported to House. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1965 and H.R. 2728. The resolution provides for one hour of debate and makes in order only those further amendments printed in the Rules report 113-271. The rule provides one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/12/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 187.
Type of Action: Calendars
11/12/2013 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-261.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/31/2013 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 15.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/31/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/31/2013 House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/18/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/18/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
07/18/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral