There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To eliminate the 2013 statutory pay adjustment for Federal employees.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/15/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 261 - 154 (Roll no. 44).(text: CR H558)
01/15/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
02/25/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
02/15/2013-11:21amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/15/2013-11:21amHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 261 - 154 (Roll no. 44). (text: CR H558)
02/15/2013-11:11amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H567-568)
02/15/2013-10:46amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 273, the Chair put the question on adoption of the bill and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Issa demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of H.R. 273 until later in the legislative day.
02/15/2013-10:45amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H566)
02/15/2013-9:37amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 273.
02/15/2013-9:37amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 273 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. Section 2 of the resolution provides that during any recess or adjournment of not more than three days, the Speaker or his designee may reconvene the House at a time other than that previously appointed, within the limits of clause 4, section 5, article I of the Constitution. Section 3 of the resolution authorizes the Speaker to entertain motions to suspend the rules through the legislative day of February 15, 2013, relating to a measure condemning the government of North Korea and its February 12, 2013 test of a nuclear device. Section 4 provides that on any legislative day from February 16, 2013 through February 22, 2013: (a) the Journal of the proceedings of the previous day shall be considered as approved; (b) the Chair may adjourn the House to meet at a date and time within the limits of clause 4, section 5, article I of the Constitution. Section 5 authorizes the Speaker to appoint Members to perform the duties of the Chair for the duration of the period addressed by section 4 as though under clause 8(a) of rule I.
02/15/2013-9:36amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 66. (consideration: CR H558-566)
02/14/2013-3:32pmHouseRule H. Res. 66 passed House.
02/13/2013-7:45pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 66 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 273 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. Section 2 of the resolution provides that during any recess or adjournment of not more than three days, the Speaker or his designee may reconvene the House at a time other than that previously appointed, within the limits of clause 4, section 5, article I of the Constitution. Section 3 of the resolution authorizes the Speaker to entertain motions to suspend the rules through the legislative day of February 15, 2013, relating to a measure condemning the government of North Korea and its February 12, 2013 test of a nuclear device. Section 4 provides that on any legislative day from February 16, 2013 through February 22, 2013: (a) the Journal
01/15/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
01/15/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/18/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/18/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/18/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/23/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/23/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/08/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/08/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/08/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/14/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/14/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/15/2013 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/25/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.273. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (02/15/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2011, as amended by the Continuing Appropriations Resolution, 2013 (P.L. 112-175), to extend through December 31, 2013: (1) the freeze on statutory pay adjustments for federal employees and officials, and (2) the prohibition against any member of the Senior Executive Service or any senior level employee in the executive branch from receiving an increase in his or her rate of basic pay absent a change of position that results in a substantial increase in responsibility or a promotion.

Eliminates the delayed statutory pay adjustment contained in the Resolution that was permitted to take effect with the first applicable pay period beginning after March 27, 2013.