Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/26/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/02/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/03/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/08/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/08/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/08/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/08/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/10/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/11/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/16/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/29/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/29/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/08/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/08/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/05/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/06/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/20/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/24/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014