Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/22/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/10/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/23/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/26/2014