There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Democracy Promotion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the application of certain restrictive eligibility requirements to foreign nongovernmental organizations with respect to the provision of assistance under part I of the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/18/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/18/2013Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (124)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/18/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/18/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/09/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/16/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 09/18/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/18/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2738. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/18/2013)

Global Democracy Promotion Act - States that, with respect to eligibility for assistance under part I of the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961, foreign nongovernmental organizations shall not be ineligible for such assistance solely on the basis of health or medical services provided by such organizations with non-U.S. government funds if such services do not violate the laws of the country in which they are being provided and would not violate U.S. federal law if provided in the United States.

Declares in addition that foreign nongovernmental organizations shall not be subject to requirements relating to the use of non-U.S. government funds for advocacy and lobbying activities other than those that apply to U.S. nongovernmental organizations receiving assistance under part I of such Act.