Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/14/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/14/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/05/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/25/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/17/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/07/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/14/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/25/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/27/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/12/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/20/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/20/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/20/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/04/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/04/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/19/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/10/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/08/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/08/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/08/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/19/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/20/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/27/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/27/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/28/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/17/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/10/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 07/22/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 09/18/2014