There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Eagle Parks Pass Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make the National Parks and Federal Recreational Lands Pass available at a discount to certain veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/18/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/04/2014Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
08/13/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/25/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/18/2013Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2013Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/30/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/12/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/18/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation07/25/2013 Referred to
04/04/2014 Hearings by
House Agriculture07/18/2013 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry08/13/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2743.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2743. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/18/2013)

Veterans Eagle Parks Pass Act - Makes the National Parks and Federal Recreational Lands Pass available at a discount to certain veterans.

Makes a National Parks and Federal Recreational Lands Pass made available under this Act valid for the life of the veteran for whom it was purchased.