Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/18/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/22/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/06/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/05/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/14/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/18/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/23/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/18/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/18/2014