Refine your search

17 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
11/21/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-50.
11/21/2013 Signed by President.
11/14/2013 House Presented to President.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/06/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
11/05/2013 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7834)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
10/30/2013 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 231.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
10/30/2013 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin without amendment. Without written report.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
10/30/2013 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
09/11/2013 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
09/10/2013-2:16pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 10 (Roll no. 451). (text: CR H5449)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-2:05pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5456)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-12:55pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-12:47pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2747.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-12:47pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5449-5450)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/10/2013-12:47pm House Mr. Walberg moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives