There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Streamlining Claims Processing for Federal Contractor Employees Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Streamlining Claims Processing for Federal Contractor Employees Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Streamlining Claims Processing for Federal Contractor Employees Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Streamlining Claims Processing for Federal Contractor Employees Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Streamlining Claims Processing for Federal Contractor Employees Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 40, United States Code, to transfer certain functions from the Government Accountability Office to the Department of Labor relating to the processing of claims for the payment of workers who were not paid appropriate wages under certain provisions of such title.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/21/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-50. (TXT | PDF)
11/21/2013 Signed by President.
11/14/2013 Presented to President.
11/05/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7834)
10/30/2013 Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin without amendment. Without written report.
09/10/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 10 (Roll no. 451).(text: CR H5449)
07/19/2013 Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
11/21/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-50. (TXT | PDF)
11/21/2013 Signed by President.
11/14/2013 House Presented to President.
11/06/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
11/05/2013 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7834)
10/30/2013 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 231.
10/30/2013 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
10/30/2013 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
09/11/2013 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/10/2013-2:16pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 10 (Roll no. 451). (text: CR H5449)
09/10/2013-2:05pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5456)
09/10/2013-12:55pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/10/2013-12:47pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2747.
09/10/2013-12:47pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5449-5450)
09/10/2013-12:47pm House Mr. Walberg moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/19/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
07/19/2013 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/19/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/19/2013 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/11/2013 Referred to
10/30/2013 Markup by
10/30/2013 Reported by

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.2747.

Subjects (8)

  • Administrative remedies
  • Department of Labor
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Government Accountability Office (GAO)
  • Labor standards
  • Public contracts and procurement
  • Wages and earnings

Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2747. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-50 (11/21/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Streamlining Claims Processing for Federal Contractor Employees Act - Transfers authority from the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to the Department of Labor for processing claims for wages due to laborers and mechanics hired by contractors on public works projects.