Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/22/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/24/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 10/22/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/27/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/04/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 06/09/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/11/2014