Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/19/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-288.
12/19/2014 Signed by President.
12/17/2014 Presented to President.
12/15/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/2014 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6839)
07/30/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5147)
07/19/2013 Introduced in House