Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/23/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/26/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/28/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/03/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/07/2013