Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/25/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/25/2014