There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Save Our Seasons Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to promote the economic survival of seasonal small businesses by ensuring that the wages paid to H-2B nonimmigrants are fair and reasonable.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/19/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/13/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/19/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/19/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/10/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/10/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/19/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security09/13/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2765.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2765. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/19/2013)

Save Our Seasons Act of 2013 - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to require that wages paid to H-2B visa temporary nonagricultural workers shall be the greater of: (1) the actual wage level paid by the employer to other employees with similar experience and qualifications for such position, or (2) the prevailing wage level for the occupational classification of the position in the geographic area of the employment.