Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/22/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/25/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/25/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/25/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/25/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/25/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/26/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/26/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 10/08/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/16/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/16/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/16/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/29/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/29/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 10/29/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 10/29/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/18/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/10/2014
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 12/11/2014