There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Rape Survivor Child Custody Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Attorney General to make grants to States that have in place laws that terminate the parental rights of men who father children through rape.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/22/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/13/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/22/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/25/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/31/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 08/02/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/09/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/09/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/09/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/09/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 09/20/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/25/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 09/25/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/11/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/22/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/05/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/14/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/22/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/22/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/09/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/10/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/13/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/22/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations09/13/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2772. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/22/2013)

Rape Survivor Child Custody Act - Directs the Attorney General to make grants to states that have in place a law that allows the mother of any child that was conceived through rape to seek court-ordered termination of the parental rights of her rapist with regard to that child, which the court shall grant upon clear and convincing evidence of rape.

Limits such a grant to: (1) an amount that is not greater than 10% of the average of the total funding of the 3 most recent awards a state received under the STOP Violence Against Women Formula Grant Program and the Sexual Assault Services Program; and (2) a 1-year term, subject to renewal for not more than 3 additional years.

Requires a state that receives such a grant to use: (1) 25% of grant funds for permissible uses under the STOP Violence Against Women Formula Grant Program, and (2) 75% of funds for permissible uses under the Sexual Assault Services Program.