Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/23/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 08/02/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/24/2014