Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/25/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/25/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/25/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/31/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/31/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/31/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 08/01/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 08/02/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/10/2013