Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/31/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/30/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/18/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/17/2014