Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/28/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/26/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/14/2014