Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 08/01/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/23/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/03/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew