There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Act of June 18, 1934, to reaffirm the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to take land into trust for Indian tribes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/15/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/31/2013Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/15/2013Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/15/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/04/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 08/01/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 02/04/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/04/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/26/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/26/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/02/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/02/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/09/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/09/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 06/24/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/24/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/08/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/16/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/15/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/15/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs01/31/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.279. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/15/2013)

Amends the Indian Reorganization Act to make it applicable to all federally recognized Indian tribes, regardless of when any tribe became recognized. (This effectively overrules the Supreme Court's decision in Carcieri v. Salazar, which held that the Secretary of the Interior could not take land into trust for a specified tribe because that tribe had not been under federal jurisdiction when the Act was enacted.)